This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/17/2023 at 11:49:08 (UTC).

TARP & RESTORATION GEEKS CORP. vs CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/29/2023 TARP RESTORATION GEEKS CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CYPRESS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, M. Joseph and Chandler, Cory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8021

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Chandler, Cory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOLD DETAILS CORPORATION

TARP & RESTORATION GEEKS CORP.

TAYLOR, LINDA

Defendant

CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALVAREZ, ROGER A

MOLINA , MARIO I.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/29/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/29/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE

09/29/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

09/29/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/29/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/02/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/02/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/05/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

COMPLAINT

09/29/2023: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/07/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TARP & RESTORATION GEEKS CORP.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLD DETAILS CORPORATION; Plaintiff: TARP & RESTORATION GEEKS CORP.; Plaintiff: TAYLOR, LINDA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLD DETAILS CORPORATION; Plaintiff: TARP & RESTORATION GEEKS CORP.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLD DETAILS CORPORATION; Plaintiff: TARP & RESTORATION GEEKS CORP.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLD DETAILS CORPORATION; Plaintiff: TARP & RESTORATION GEEKS CORP.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLD DETAILS CORPORATION; Plaintiff: TARP & RESTORATION GEEKS CORP.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLD DETAILS CORPORATION; Plaintiff: TARP & RESTORATION GEEKS CORP.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLD DETAILS CORPORATION; Plaintiff: TARP & RESTORATION GEEKS CORP.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less