This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 09/01/2023 at 19:50:00 (UTC).

ARTIS, TROIN vs VANCE, DAVID CHARLES

Case Summary

On 03/22/2023 ARTIS, TROIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VANCE, DAVID CHARLES. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, A. Emily, Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. . and Gaylord Moe, .. Anne-Leigh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8886

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. .

Gaylord Moe, .. Anne-Leigh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARTIS, TROIN

Defendants

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GELCO FLEET TRUST

VANCE, DAVID CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TASKER , JAMIE RYAN

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/22/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/22/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/22/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/22/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

03/22/2023: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/22/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/19/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/19/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/19/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/19/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/19/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION HT AND STAY

04/24/2023: ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION HT AND STAY

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

07/07/2023: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION HT AND STAY; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: GELCO FLEET TRUST; Defendant: VANCE, DAVID CHARLES; Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN; Date Signed: 04/24/2023;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ARTIS, TROIN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less