This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/19/2023 at 09:27:42 (UTC).

2018-3 IH Borrower LP vs Woolsey, Nicholas

Case Summary

On 04/24/2023 2018-3 IH Borrower LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Woolsey, Nicholas. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, C. Melissa and Black, Melissa. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8822

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Black, C. Melissa

Black, Melissa. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2018-3 IH Borrower LP

Defendants

Woolsey, Lauren

Woolsey, Nicholas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL , MATTHEW EDWARD

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/24/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/24/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/24/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/24/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/25/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/25/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/27/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/27/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/09/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/09/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

05/09/2023: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

05/09/2023: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

05/09/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

05/11/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

05/16/2023: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

05/17/2023: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2018-3 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Woolsey, Lauren; Defendant: Woolsey, Nicholas;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: POSSESSION ONLY; Additional Info: Defendant: Woolsey, Lauren; Defendant: Woolsey, Nicholas;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: (FINAL) / POSSESSION ONLY AGAINST NICHOLAS WOOLSEY AND LAUREN WOOLSEY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2018-3 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2018-3 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: NICHOLAS WOLSEY 04/28/2023; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2018-3 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: LAUREN WOOLSEY 04/28/2023; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2018-3 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Woolsey, Lauren;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Woolsey, Nicholas;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2018-3 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2018-3 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2018-3 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2018-3 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2018-3 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less