This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/30/2023 at 04:58:24 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING, INC,Pacheco, Angel vs EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/08/2023 AFO IMAGING, INC,Pacheco, Angel filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Chandler, Cory and Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2715

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Chandler, Cory

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP

AFO IMAGING, INC

Pacheco, Angel

Defendant

EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

POPRITKIN , LAWRENCE DEAN

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/08/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/08/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/08/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/12/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/12/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/23/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/27/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

10/30/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

10/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Defendant: EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less