This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/18/2023 at 06:52:29 (UTC).

Nationstar Mortgage LLC vs O`Neal, Demetric

Case Summary

On 09/19/2023 Nationstar Mortgage LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against O Neal, Demetric. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5282

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Defendants

Aqua Finance Inc

O`Neal, Demetric

Shell Point Community Association Inc

Unknown Spouse Of Demetric O`Neal

Unknown Tenant In Possession Of The Subject Property

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHANSSON , CARLY ANNE

Defendant Attorney

GROSSMAN , GREGORY SAGOR

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

09/19/2023: COMPLAINT

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

09/19/2023: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

LIS PENDENS

09/19/2023: LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

10/06/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

10/06/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

10/06/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

10/06/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

10/06/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/28/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/28/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/19/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

09/19/2023: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/19/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/19/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/19/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/19/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/19/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/19/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SHELL POINT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC; Date Served: 09/22/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DEMETRIC O'NEAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC; Date Served: 09/27/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DEMETRIC O'NEAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: AQUA FINANCE, INC; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC; Date Served: 09/21/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND REQUEST FOR AFFIRMATIVE RELIEF; Additional Info: Defendant: Shell Point Community Association Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Shell Point Community Association Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X5; Additional Info: Defendant: Aqua Finance Inc; Defendant: O`Neal, Demetric; Defendant: Shell Point Community Association Inc; Defendant: Unknown Spouse Of Demetric O`Neal; Defendant: Unknown Tenant In Possession Of The Subject Property;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketStreamline Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less