This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/07/2023 at 05:41:05 (UTC).

NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA vs UBATUBA FLOORING LLC

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against UBATUBA FLOORING LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin, Richard. H and Martin, H. Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6601

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Martin, Richard. H

Martin, H. Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

UBATUBA FLOORING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHER , STACEY SAMANTHA

Defendant Attorney

POKORNY , MASON A.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/18/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/19/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

05/18/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/06/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/18/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/18/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/19/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF

07/03/2023: ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

07/06/2023: NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/06/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/06/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/06/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS; Additional Info: Defendant: UBATUBA FLOORING LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketANSWER AND DEFENSES OF; Additional Info: Defendant: UBATUBA FLOORING LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: UBATUBA FLOORING LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: UBATUBA FLOORING LLC 05/30/2023; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: UBATUBA FLOORING LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less