This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/30/2023 at 02:51:33 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY vs SMITH, NORMAN A.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2023 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SMITH, NORMAN A. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas, K. Cheryl and Thomas, Cheryl. K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4561

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Thomas, K. Cheryl

Thomas, Cheryl. K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Defendants

GWENDOLYN F. SMITH

SMITH, NORMAN A.

SUTTON WOODS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

TENANT I/UNKNOWN TENANT

TENANT II/UNKNOWN TENANT

TENANT III/UNKNOWN TENANT

TENANT IV/UNKNOWN TENANT

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GWENDOLYN F. SMITH

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NORMAN A. SMITH A/K/A NORMAN SMITH

WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NUSSBAUM , WILLIAM, III

Defendant Attorney

BURNS , BRITTNIE MARIE

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

10/27/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

10/19/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

09/08/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

08/17/2023: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/15/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/15/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/15/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

08/15/2023: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

10/27/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: SMITH, NORMAN A.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: EXHIBIT(S) ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: SMITH, NORMAN A.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON THE LAST OF ALL NAMED DEFTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: NORMAN A SMITH AKA NORMAN SMITH 09/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GWENDOLYN F. SMITH;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: GWENDOLYN F. SMITH;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023

JudgementJudgment Code: NDUNP; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY; Judge: Thomas, Cheryl K

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023

DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: EXHIBIT(S) ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GWENDOLYN F. SMITH;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCertification of Original Note Possession FS702.015(4); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketStreamline Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less