This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/11/2023 at 06:31:36 (UTC).

All Accidents Chiropractic Center, Pllc,Marshall, Lynnasher vs Geico Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 09/16/2023 All Accidents Chiropractic Center, Pllc,Marshall, Lynnasher filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico Indemnity Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, Lisa. A and Allen, A. Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4652

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, Lisa. A

Allen, A. Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

All Accidents Chiropractic Center, Pllc

Marshall, Lynnasher

Defendant

Geico Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SULLIVAN , AMY TESS

Defendant Attorney

DUTTON , CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/16/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/16/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/16/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/16/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

09/16/2023: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

09/16/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/16/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/19/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/19/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

09/26/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/11/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/13/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

10/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Accidents Chiropractic Center, Pllc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Accidents Chiropractic Center, Pllc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Accidents Chiropractic Center, Pllc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Accidents Chiropractic Center, Pllc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Accidents Chiropractic Center, Pllc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Accidents Chiropractic Center, Pllc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Accidents Chiropractic Center, Pllc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Accidents Chiropractic Center, Pllc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less