This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/06/2023 at 12:26:48 (UTC).

Davis Spine And Orthopaedics, Llc.,Green, Le Candace vs Geico General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Davis Spine And Orthopaedics, Llc ,Green, Le Candace filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7088

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Davis Spine And Orthopaedics, Llc.

Green, Le Candace

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LICZNERSKI , ALEXANDER DARIUSZ

Defendant Attorney

DUTTON , CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/19/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

05/19/2023: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/19/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/26/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/26/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

OBJECTION AND MOTION

07/19/2023: OBJECTION AND MOTION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION AND MOTION; Comment: FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO PLAINTIFF'S PROPOUNDED DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis Spine And Orthopaedics, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis Spine And Orthopaedics, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis Spine And Orthopaedics, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis Spine And Orthopaedics, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis Spine And Orthopaedics, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis Spine And Orthopaedics, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis Spine And Orthopaedics, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis Spine And Orthopaedics, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis Spine And Orthopaedics, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less