This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/18/2023 at 09:23:42 (UTC).

West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc,Walker, Natasha vs GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/07/2023 West Chiropractic Neuropathy Center, Llc,Walker, Natasha filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Makholm, Marc. S and Makholm, S. Marc. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2368

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Makholm, Marc. S

Makholm, S. Marc

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Walker, Natasha

West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc

Defendants

Geico General Insurance Company

Gieco Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LICZNERSKI , ALEXANDER DARIUSZ

Defendant Attorney

WALKER , EBONY VONTRICE

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/12/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/06/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/18/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/05/2023: AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

AMENDED NOTICE

10/05/2023: AMENDED NOTICE

AMENDED REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/05/2023: AMENDED REQUEST TO PRODUCE

AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/05/2023: AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

AMENDED NOTICE

10/05/2023: AMENDED NOTICE

AMENDED NOTICE

10/05/2023: AMENDED NOTICE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

10/05/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/12/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/07/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

09/07/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

09/07/2023: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/07/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/07/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/07/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: (AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT); Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED NOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED NOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED NOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, Llc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less