This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/30/2023 at 06:14:58 (UTC).

HOLLSTROM & ASSOCIATES INC,ROSADO, ALYSSA vs GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/10/2023 HOLLSTROM ASSOCIATES INC,ROSADO, ALYSSA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, C. Melissa and Black, Melissa. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3499

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Black, C. Melissa

Black, Melissa. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOLLSTROM & ASSOCIATES INC

ROSADO, ALYSSA

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIGORI , KEITH PATRICK

Defendant Attorney

PALUMBO , NORMAN ANTHONY SANTO, III

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/03/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/23/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

04/10/2023: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/25/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/25/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/23/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/23/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/23/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/23/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/03/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/10/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/10/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/10/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/10/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/10/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/10/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/10/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

04/10/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLSTROM & ASSOCIATES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLSTROM & ASSOCIATES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLSTROM & ASSOCIATES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLSTROM & ASSOCIATES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLSTROM & ASSOCIATES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLSTROM & ASSOCIATES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLSTROM & ASSOCIATES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLSTROM & ASSOCIATES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLSTROM & ASSOCIATES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLSTROM & ASSOCIATES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLSTROM & ASSOCIATES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLSTROM & ASSOCIATES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less