This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/15/2023 at 21:51:02 (UTC).

Evers, Regan vs Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 Evers, Regan filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Universal Property Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Polo, M.. Melissa, Polo, Melissa. M. and Polo, Melissa M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2723

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Polo, M.. Melissa

Polo, Melissa. M.

Polo, Melissa M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Evers, Regan

Defendant

Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARBER , DAVID SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

SMITH , ANTHONEY MARCEL

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/08/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO DISMISS

08/08/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/26/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

06/28/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/02/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

COMPLAINT

05/24/2023: COMPLAINT

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/14/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/14/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/14/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/14/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION TO STRIKE

08/28/2023: MOTION TO STRIKE

INTERROGATORIES

05/24/2023: INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/15/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/02/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/24/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/24/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/24/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/24/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: ZOOM HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/8901592416 MEETING NUMBER: 890-159-2416IF JOINING BY PHONE, DIAL 1-786-635-1003; Judicial Officer: Polo, Melissa M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less