This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/26/2023 at 06:05:55 (UTC).

Evers, Regan vs Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 Evers, Regan filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Universal Property Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Polo, M.. Melissa, Polo, Melissa M. and Polo, Melissa. M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2723

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Polo, M.. Melissa

Polo, Melissa M.

Polo, Melissa. M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Evers, Regan

Defendant

Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARBER , DAVID SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

SMITH , ANTHONEY MARCEL

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/25/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL

10/16/2023: ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL

ORDER CANCELLING HEARING

10/16/2023: ORDER CANCELLING HEARING

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/12/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/14/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/14/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/14/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/14/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION TO STRIKE

08/28/2023: MOTION TO STRIKE

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/07/2024

HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 10:45 AM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 504View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2023

HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Cancelled Comments: Per Judge's Order; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: ZOOM HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/8901592416 MEETING NUMBER: 890-159-2416IF JOINING BY PHONE, DIAL 1-786-635-1003; Judicial Officer: Polo, Melissa M.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company; Plaintiff: Evers, Regan; Private Attorney: FARBER , DAVID SCOTT; Private Attorney: SMITH , ANTHONEY MARCEL; Date Signed: 10/16/2023; Judicial Officer:: Polo, Melissa M.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company; Plaintiff: Evers, Regan; Private Attorney: FARBER , DAVID SCOTT; Private Attorney: SMITH , ANTHONEY MARCEL; Date Signed: 10/16/2023; Judicial Officer:: Polo, Melissa M.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Evers, Regan;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less