This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/19/2023 at 02:34:47 (UTC).

SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC,JOANIS, JENNIFER vs SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/06/2023 SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC,JOANIS, JENNIFER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2849

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOANIS, JENNIFER

SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC

Defendant

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIGORI , KEITH PATRICK

Defendant Attorney

SWIECINSKA , MONIKA ANNA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

09/07/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

09/07/2023: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/28/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

08/28/2023: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

07/25/2023: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

07/25/2023: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/05/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

04/06/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/07/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/05/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/06/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/06/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/06/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/06/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/06/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

04/06/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

04/06/2023: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO FILE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less