This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/16/2023 at 14:55:36 (UTC).

Burke Collins Therapy, Inc.,Edwards, Charles vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 Burke Collins Therapy, Inc ,Edwards, Charles filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael and Hooi, Michael. J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4329

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Burke Collins Therapy, Inc.

Edwards, Charles

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEMAGO , MARC JORDAN

Defendant Attorney

CHIN , SARAH JO

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/15/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/15/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/15/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/15/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/15/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/17/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/17/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/17/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/24/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/01/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/07/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVING

11/07/2023: NOTICE OF SERVING

 

Docket Entries

11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Burke Collins Therapy, Inc.; Plaintiff: Edwards, Charles;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Burke Collins Therapy, Inc.; Plaintiff: Edwards, Charles;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Burke Collins Therapy, Inc.; Plaintiff: Edwards, Charles;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Burke Collins Therapy, Inc.; Plaintiff: Edwards, Charles;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less