This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/17/2019 at 08:26:06 (UTC).

CARTER, JUDY vs Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/27/2018 CARTER, JUDY filed an Other lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Campbell, D. Lisa, Huey, L. Paul, Lefler, Lawrence, Tibbals, D.. Wesley and Tharpe, A.. Chet. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2579

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Campbell, D. Lisa

Huey, L. Paul

Lefler, Lawrence

Tibbals, D.. Wesley

Tharpe, A.. Chet

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARTER, JUDY

Brandon, FL 33511-6731

CARTER, JOSEPH

Defendant

Target Corporation

1200 S. Pine Island Rd.

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING , DANIEL WILLIAM

Attorney at CURRY LAW GROUP PA

750 W Lumsden Rd

Brandon, FL 33511

Defendant Attorney

HOLCOMB , JOHN LEWIS

Attorney at 101 E KENNEDY BLVD, STE 3700

Po Box 2231

Tampa, FL 33601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

03/21/2019: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/20/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/15/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/15/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/28/2018: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/27/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/27/2018: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/27/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/27/2018: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/18/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/18/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/17/2019: ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER

01/15/2019: ANSWER

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/15/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/15/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/27/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/27/2018: COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/27/2018: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Additional Info: Defendant: Target Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CARTER, JOSEPH; Plaintiff: CARTER, JUDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CARTER, JOSEPH; Plaintiff: CARTER, JUDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Comment: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; Additional Info: Defendant: Target Corporation; Plaintiff: CARTER, JOSEPH; Plaintiff: CARTER, JUDY; Private Attorney: HOLCOMB , JOHN LEWIS; Private Attorney: KING , DANIEL WILLIAM; Date Signed: 03/13/2019; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, Chet A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Comment: TARGET CORPORATION S ENTRY OF STIPULATED; Additional Info: Defendant: Target Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: ON 2/27/2019 AT 8:30 AM; Additional Info: Defendant: Target Corporation; Plaintiff: CARTER, JOSEPH; Plaintiff: CARTER, JUDY; Private Attorney: HOLCOMB , JOHN LEWIS; Private Attorney: KING , DANIEL WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO DISQUALIFY CASE REASSIGNED TO; Comment: DIVISION T - ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION ON COURT'S INITIATIVE (02/26/2019 W.D.T); Additional Info: Defendant: Target Corporation; Plaintiff: CARTER, JOSEPH; Plaintiff: CARTER, JUDY; Private Attorney: HOLCOMB , JOHN LEWIS; Private Attorney: KING , DANIEL WILLIAM; Date Signed: 02/26/2019; Judicial Officer: Tibbals, Wesley D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CARTER, JOSEPH; Plaintiff: CARTER, JUDY; Private Attorney: KING , DANIEL WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Target Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CARTER, JUDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CARTER, JUDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CARTER, JUDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: CARTER, JUDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Comment: EAST DIVISION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CARTER, JUDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CARTER, JUDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CARTER, JUDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CARTER, JUDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NORFC; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Judge: Tharpe, Chet A.

    Read MoreRead Less