This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/30/2023 at 03:45:51 (UTC).

Carovano, Deidre D vs Goodwin, Katharine

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 Carovano, Deidre D filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against Goodwin, Katharine. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, A. Emily, Peacock, Emily. A and Peacock, Emily A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9428

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Peacock, Emily. A

Peacock, Emily A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carovano, Deidre D

Defendants and Decedents

Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.

Goodwin, Chirstopher B

GOODWIN, CHRISTOPHER B.

Goodwin, Katharine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RINALDI , THOMAS KENNETH

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/09/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/09/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

11/09/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/09/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LETTER TO

11/14/2022: LETTER TO

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/14/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/14/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/17/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/17/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/17/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/17/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

12/06/2022: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

12/06/2022: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/3058068636 MEETING ID: 305-806-8636 NO PASSWORD IS REQUIREDTELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME CODE AS ZOOM ID; Judicial Officer: Peacock, Emily A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE; Comment: CRESSIDA DIXON ACCEPTS ON BEHALF OF KATHARINE GOODWIN; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carovano, Deidre D;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE; Comment: CHRISTOPHER B. GOODWIN ACCEPTS INDIVIDUALLY AND AS BENEFICIARY OF THE CHRISTOPHER B. GOODWIN LIVING TRUST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carovano, Deidre D;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carovano, Deidre D;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carovano, Deidre D;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Goodwin, Chirstopher B; Defendant: Goodwin, Katharine;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: SUMMONS REQUEST trinaldi@bsk.com; knettles@bsk.com; eservicefl@bsk.com; Additional Info: Private Attorney: RINALDI , THOMAS KENNETH;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carovano, Deidre D;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carovano, Deidre D;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carovano, Deidre D;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carovano, Deidre D;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less