This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 12/02/2019 at 07:37:03 (UTC).

Carolinas Construction Solutions, LLC vs EAG-LED, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Carolinas Construction Solutions, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EAG-LED, LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6730

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carolinas Construction Solutions, LLC

1031 W. Morse Blvd., Suite 120

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendants

EAG-LED, LLC

13046 Race Track Road, Suite 187

Tampa, FL 33626

Grant, Amy M.

Oldsmar, FL 34677

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SASSO , MICHAEL ADAM

Attorney at SASSO & SASSO, P.A.

1525 International Pkwy Ste 4021

Lake Mary, FL 32746

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/28/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/28/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/28/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

10/28/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR

10/31/2019: REQUEST FOR

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

11/01/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

11/01/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carolinas Construction Solutions, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Grant, Amy M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: EAG-LED, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carolinas Construction Solutions, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carolinas Construction Solutions, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carolinas Construction Solutions, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carolinas Construction Solutions, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carolinas Construction Solutions, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Judge: Judge, Senior

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL A SASSO, ESQ