This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/02/2022 at 15:09:24 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A. vs Johnson, Abdulmatin

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Capital One Bank Usa , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Johnson, Abdulmatin. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, James S, Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3507

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, James S

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

1 5Th Avenue S

Lake Worth, FL 33460

Defendant

Johnson, Abdulmatin

Valrico, FL 33594-2602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA , KEVIN JOHN

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN, P.A.

806 S Douglas Rd Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

05/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/20/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/20/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

05/23/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

06/09/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Non-Service on Summons; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/97219657408 ZOOM MEETING ID IS 972-1965-7408PASSWORD IS 031612 Judicial Officer: Giardina, James S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: DEFT: ABDULMATIN JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Johnson, Abdulmatin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin