This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/24/2022 at 02:46:29 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A. vs Jackson, Chloe A

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Capital One Bank Usa , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jackson, Chloe A. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael, Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1667

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

Po Box 47718

Jacksonville, FL 32247

Defendant

Jackson, Chloe A

Ruskin, FL 33570-4632

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STERN , DOMINIC MICHAEL

Attorney at MR. DOMINIC MICHAEL STERN

Po Box 47718

Jacksonville, FL 32247-7718

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/13/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/13/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/13/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/13/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

05/16/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE

06/13/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Non-Service on Summons; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 304 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Jackson, Chloe A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOMINIC M STERN