This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/04/2020 at 23:21:48 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs HAYNES, MICHELLE A

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed an Other lawsuit against HAYNES, MICHELLE A. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, E. Jared. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2540

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, E. Jared

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

15000 Capital One Dr

Richmond, VA 23238

Defendant

HAYNES, MICHELLE A

Tampa, FL 33617

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEREZ , J L

Attorney at BROCK & SCOTT, PLLC

1315 Westbrook Plaza Dr

Winston Salem, NC 27103

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

06/11/2019: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

04/10/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

04/09/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

04/05/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/01/2019: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

02/12/2019: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/07/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

Signature Page For Clerk's Default

02/07/2019: Signature Page For Clerk's Default

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

02/07/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

CERTIFIED COPY OF

01/14/2019: CERTIFIED COPY OF

CERTIFIED COPY OF

01/14/2019: CERTIFIED COPY OF

COMPLAINT

01/14/2019: COMPLAINT

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

01/14/2019: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

01/14/2019: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

01/14/2019: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

01/14/2019: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

TRANSMITTAL LETTER

01/14/2019: TRANSMITTAL LETTER

TRANSMITTAL LETTER

01/14/2019: TRANSMITTAL LETTER

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: DJ; Judgment Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2019253695; Judge: Smith, Jared E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: (FINAL) AGAINST MICHELLE A. HAYNES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: HAYNES, MICHELLE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: HAYNES, MICHELLE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketSignature Page For Clerk's Default; Additional Info: Defendant: HAYNES, MICHELLE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: MICHELLE A. HAYNES 11/13/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: DUE TO NO CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE; Additional Info: Defendant: HAYNES, MICHELLE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: HAYNES, MICHELLE A

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF; Comment: ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF; Comment: HERNANDO COUNTY COURT CASE DOCKET SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Hernando County Court Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Hernando County Court Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Hernando County Court Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Hernando County Court Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Hernando County Court Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSMITTAL LETTER; Additional Info: Defendant: HAYNES, MICHELLE A; Private Attorney: PEREZ , J L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSMITTAL LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less