This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/02/2022 at 05:55:18 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A. vs Harris, Deogory T

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Capital One Bank Usa , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Harris, Deogory T. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3514

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

1 5Th Avenue S

Lake Worth, FL 33460

Defendant

Harris, Deogory T

Riverview, FL 33579-2108

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA , KEVIN JOHN

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN, P.A.

806 S Douglas Rd Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

05/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/20/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/20/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

05/20/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/03/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 312 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Schultz-Kin, Leslie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 5/31/2022 DEFT DEOGORY T HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Harris, Deogory T

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin