This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/11/2021 at 01:59:51 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A. vs Concepcion, Martha

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Capital One Bank Usa , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Concepcion, Martha. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam, Valkenburg, Miriam. V. and Valkenburg, Miriam V.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6852

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Valkenburg, Miriam V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

Po Box 44718

Jacksonville, FL 32247

Defendant

Concepcion, Martha

Tampa, FL 33604

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINSON , LARRY BENNETT

Attorney at DEBSKI & ASSOCIATES, P.A.

4417 Beach Blvd Ste 400

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Defendant Attorney

CASTELLANOS , J NICHOLAS

Attorney at HOLLAND LAW GROUP

3639 Cortez Rd W Ste 130

Bradenton, FL 34210-3157

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/09/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

03/01/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/19/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/19/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/19/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021150442; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Concepcion, Martha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Concepcion, Martha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNO SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: (AWAITING ON PRETRIAL DATES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTELLANOS , J NICHOLAS