This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/28/2022 at 18:19:50 (UTC).

CALVARY SPY I, LLC, vs CLEWELL, CARRIE A

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 CALVARY SPY I, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CLEWELL, CARRIE A. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lopez, Susan. S and Lopez, S. Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1950

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lopez, Susan. S

Lopez, S. Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALVARY SPY I, LLC,

Defendant

CLEWELL, CARRIE A

Tampa, FL 33607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYERS , BREANNA NICOLE TIFFANY

Attorney at MS. BREANNA NICOLE TIFFANY MAYERS

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant Attorney

DICKERSON , MATTHEW JOSEPH

Attorney at HERITAGE LAW GROUP

120 N Collins St Ste 201

Plant City, FL 33563

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

05/23/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

05/23/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MOTION TO STRIKE

04/29/2022: MOTION TO STRIKE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/26/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/26/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/26/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/26/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVING

04/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING

COMPLAINT

04/04/2022: COMPLAINT

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

04/04/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

04/04/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

04/04/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

04/04/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

04/04/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

04/04/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

04/04/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

04/04/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

04/04/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022266657; Judge: Lopez, Susan S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Comment: AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CALVARY SPY I, LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: CLEWELL, CARRIE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: CLEWELL, CARRIE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: CLEWELL, CARRIE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: CLEWELL, CARRIE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Comment: FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; Additional Info: Defendant: CLEWELL, CARRIE A

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From The Pasco County Court Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From The Pasco County Court Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From The Pasco County Court Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From The Pasco County Court Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From The Pasco County Court Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From The Pasco County Court Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From The Pasco County Court Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From The Pasco County Court Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSMITTAL LETTER; Additional Info: Defendant: CLEWELL, CARRIE A; Private Attorney: MAYERS , BREANNA NICOLE TIFFANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSMITTAL LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer M JOSEPH DICKERSON