This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/16/2021 at 08:27:48 (UTC).

Caddle, Doris vs Burlington Coat Factory of Florida, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 Caddle, Doris filed an Other lawsuit against Burlington Coat Factory of Florida, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel, L. Helene, Barbas, Rex and Daniel, Helene. L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0881

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Daniel, L. Helene

Barbas, Rex

Daniel, Helene. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Caddle, Doris

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendants

Burlington Coat Factory of Florida, LLC

1830 Route 130

Burlington, NJ 08016

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REED , PAUL STUART

Attorney at REED & REED LAW, PLLC

101 E Lumsden Rd

Brandon, FL 33511

Defendant Attorney

BELL , BRADLEY SCOTT

Attorney at BELL LAW GROUP, PA

407 N Howard Ave Ste 201

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

AMENDED COMPLAINT

02/09/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

02/03/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/01/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/01/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/01/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/01/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/01/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Caddle, Doris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Caddle, Doris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Caddle, Doris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Caddle, Doris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Caddle, Doris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Caddle, Doris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: COS 2/9/2021 / NO EXHIBITS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Caddle, Doris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 02/03/2021 DEFT. BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Defendant: Burlington Coat Factory of Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Burlington Coat Factory of Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Defendant: Burlington Coat Factory of Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Burlington Coat Factory of Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Burlington Coat Factory of Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELL BRADLEY S