This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 04:53:15 (UTC).

Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No 15 Llc vs Miranda, Aida

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No 15 Llc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Miranda, Aida. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Makholm, S. Marc, Makholm, Marc. S, Makholm, Marc S, Lopez, S. Susan and Lopez, Susan. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3397

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Makholm, S. Marc

Makholm, Marc. S

Makholm, Marc S

Lopez, S. Susan

Lopez, Susan. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No 15 Llc

100 Second Ave South Suite 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Comenity Capital Bank

Defendant

Miranda, Aida

Tampa, FL 33619-4724

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LACZEWSKI , JOHN MARK

Attorney at RAUSCH STURM LLC

212 Wells Rd

Wethersfield, CT 06109

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/09/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/09/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/09/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

08/10/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

08/16/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Makholm, Marc S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: AIDA MIRANDA 8/15/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Miranda, Aida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No 15 Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No 15 Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No 15 Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No 15 Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMENITY CAPITAL BANK- BJ MC is a litigant

Latest cases where BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LACZEWSKI , J MARK