This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/13/2023 at 04:28:46 (UTC).

Brumfield, Maria vs Estate Of Ralph Brumfield

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Brumfield, Maria filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Estate Of Ralph Brumfield. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4020

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brumfield, Maria

Riverview, FL 33569

Defendants

Allen, Gloria

Fresco, CA 93705

Avery, Hester

Hayward, CA 94542

Avery, Natasha

Berkley, CA 94703

Brumfield, Denae

Mayslanding, NJ 08330

Brumfield, Eddie

Brooklyn, NY 11235

Brumfield, Jovan

Atlantic City, NJ 08401

Brumfield, Lash

Tuckerton, NJ 08087

Brumfield, Rashaun

Harbor Ciry, NJ 08215

Estate Of Ralph Brumfield

1213 Avenue Z Apt D-30

Brooklyn, NY 11235

Fine, Christopher

New York, NY 10028

Grinnell, Allen

Derry, NH 03038

Brumfield, Reshaun

Harbor Ciry, NJ 08215

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HACHEY , STEPHEN KYLE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STEPHEN K. HACHEY, P.A.

10853 Boyette Rd

Riverview, FL 33569

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/29/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

08/23/2022: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/17/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/12/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

ANSWER AND WAIVER

08/11/2022: ANSWER AND WAIVER

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/09/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/04/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

08/03/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/07/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

05/13/2022: LIS PENDENS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/13/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

05/13/2022: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: OCTOBER 19, 2022 @ 10:45AM- VIA ZOOM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Brumfield, Eddie; Defendant: Fine, Christopher; Defendant: Grinnell, Allen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Brumfield, Eddie; Defendant: Fine, Christopher; Defendant: Grinnell, Allen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND WAIVER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Allen, Gloria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: DEFT GLORIA ALLEN; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DEFT: NATASHA AVERY- 6/25/2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: DEFT: LASH BRUMFIELD- 6/30/2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brumfield, Maria

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEPHEN KYLE HACHEY