This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/26/2022 at 01:33:22 (UTC).

Brown, Keith vs BRP US INC.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 Brown, Keith filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRP US INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Murphy, J. Logan, Lopez, Susan. S and Lopez, S. Susan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4296

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Murphy, J. Logan

Lopez, Susan. S

Lopez, S. Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brown, Keith

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

Barney's Motorcycle Sales, Inc. d/b/a Barney's

3874 Tampa Road

Oldsmar, FL 34677

BRP US INC. d/b/a SEA DOO

1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Barney's Motorcycle Sales, Inc

3874 Tampa Road

Oldsmar, FL 34677

BRP US INC.

1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KALEEL , JOSHUA THOMAS

Attorney at FARAH AND FARAH

10 W Adams St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant Attorney

SHERMAN , JEFFREY MARK

3874 Tampa Rd

Oldsmar, FL 34677-3126

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/13/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/13/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/13/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/13/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/13/2021: COMPLAINT

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/18/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/18/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/18/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION TO DISMISS

11/11/2021: MOTION TO DISMISS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/06/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/06/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF

12/10/2021: ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF

STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

03/11/2022: STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: BRP US INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO DIVISION P PER AO S-2022-003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEFENSES OF; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: BRP US INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Barney's Motorcycle Sales, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brown, Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: Barney's Motorcycle Sales, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Barney's Motorcycle Sales, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: BRP US INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brown, Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brown, Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brown, Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brown, Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brown, Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARNEYS MOTORCYLE SALES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BRP US INC. is a litigant