This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/05/2019 at 15:20:23 (UTC).

BROWN, CLIFF vsKANE FURNITURE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/27/2015 BROWN, CLIFF vsKANE FURNITURE CORPORATION was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephens, Scott. Steven, Thomas, K. Cheryl and Nielsen, A. Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6875

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Stephens, Scott. Steven

Thomas, K. Cheryl

Nielsen, A. Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROWN, CLIFF

Acosta, David

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

Mincer, Douglas

Defendant

KANE FURNITURE CORPORATION

C/O Irwin M Novak 5700 70Th Avenue North

Pinellas Park, FL 33781

Intervenor

Semino, Trina

Orlando, FL 32801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COHEN , VICTOR STEPHEN

Attorney at BAJO CUVA COHEN TURKEL, P.A.

100 N Tampa St Ste 1900

Tampa, FL 33602

CLARK, J DAN

3407 W.Kennedy Boulevard

Tampa, FL 33609-2905

CRIST , MATTHEW ALAN

Attorney at CRIST LEGAL - PA

606 E Madison St

Tampa, FL 33602-4029

CALDEVILLA , DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at DE LA PARTE & GILBERT PA

Po Box 2350

Tampa, FL 33601

POLASZEK , CHRISTOPHER STEPHEN

Attorney at THE POLASZEK LAW FIRM, PLLC

3407 W Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

ROIG , RICARDO ANTONIO

Attorney at RICARDO A. ROIG, P.L.

2803 Safe Harbor Dr

Tampa, FL 33618

Defendant Attorneys

LEONARD SELIG ENGLANDER

ENGLANDER , LEONARD SELIG

Attorney at ENGLANDER AND FISCHER LLP

721 1St Ave N

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Intervenor Attorney

MEYER , STEVEN HARRY

Attorney at CPLS, P.A.

201 E Pine St Ste 445

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/07/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR

05/04/2018: REQUEST FOR

EMERGENCY MOTION

05/15/2017: EMERGENCY MOTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/28/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION

04/26/2017: MOTION

CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING

04/12/2017: CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/26/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/01/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

COMPLAINT

07/27/2015: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/07/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

03/20/2018: MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

CLERK'S MINUTES OF HEARINGS

05/01/2017: CLERK'S MINUTES OF HEARINGS

NOTICE OF FILING

04/26/2017: NOTICE OF FILING

LETTER TO CLERK FROM

03/16/2017: LETTER TO CLERK FROM

MOTION TO INTERVENE

03/13/2017: MOTION TO INTERVENE

MOTION TO COMPEL

03/03/2017: MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/08/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

REPLY

03/24/2016: REPLY

207 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: KANE FURNITURE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: DFDT'S- MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DFDT'S- CHALLENGED CLASS DISCOVERY AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW ; PLTFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; PLTFF'S- MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL NOTICE TO CLASS.....; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BROWN, CLIFF; Plaintiff: Mincer, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: APPROVE CLASS MEMBER TO REDEEM VOUCHER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BROWN, CLIFF; Plaintiff: Mincer, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • AMENDED MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: APPROVE CLASS 1 CLAIM OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR CLASS MEMBER TO REDEEM VOUCHER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BROWN, CLIFF; Plaintiff: Mincer, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BROWN, CLIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY; Additional Info: Defendant: KANE FURNITURE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: DETERMINE CLASS MEMBER ACOSTA'S ENTITLEMENT TO TAXABLE COSTS, STATUTORY INTEREST, AND PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEYS' FEES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BROWN, CLIFF; Plaintiff: Mincer, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: DETERMINE CLASS MEMBER ACOSTA'S ENTITLEMENT TO TAXABLE COSTS, STATUTORY INTEREST, AND PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEYS' FEES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BROWN, CLIFF; Plaintiff: Mincer, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE; Comment: TO KANE S OMNIBUS MOTION TO ESTABLISH PROCEDURES TO CONDUCT HEARINGS ON CHALLENGED CLAIMS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BROWN, CLIFF; Plaintiff: Mincer, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: KANE FURNITURE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
326 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2015
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 dclark@clarkmartino.com; rsmith@clarkmartino.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: OGMTF; Judgment Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2016481697; Judge: Stephens, Steven Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: OGMTF; Judgment Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2017471482; Judge: Stephens, Steven Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: OAS; Judgment Description: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION; Instrument Number: 2017467113; Judge: Stephens, Steven Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KANE FURNITURE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEYER , STEVEN H