This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/14/2023 at 06:37:55 (UTC).

Brock, Steven vs Perridge, James Robert

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 Brock, Steven filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Perridge, James Robert. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6287

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brock, Steven

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

Perridge, James Robert

Land O'Lakes, FL 34639

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIGLIO , RICHARD DAVID

Attorney at MANEY & GORDON P.A.

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

BALLARD , CHRISTOPHER M.

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF ERICK D. MARTIN

4030 Crescent Park Dr Ste 100

Riverview, FL 33578

 

Court Documents

AMENDED ORDER

01/09/2023: AMENDED ORDER

SUPPLEMENTAL

01/06/2023: SUPPLEMENTAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

01/03/2023: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/20/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

12/16/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/16/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/16/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/08/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

11/07/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE

10/31/2022: NOTICE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/17/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

10/17/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

10/13/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/13/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/13/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

10/11/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

10/06/2022: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/26/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 501View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 501 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brock, Steven;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS TO DATE ONLY; Additional Info: Defendant: Perridge, James Robert; Plaintiff: Brock, Steven; Private Attorney: BALLARD , CHRISTOPHER M.; Private Attorney: GIGLIO , RICHARD DAVID; Date 2: 01/09/2023; Judicial Officer:: Barbas, Rex;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Defendant: Perridge, James Robert;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Perridge, James Robert;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: SUPPLEMENTAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Perridge, James Robert;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brock, Steven;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brock, Steven;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brock, Steven;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brock, Steven;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brock, Steven;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brock, Steven;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brock, Steven;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brock, Steven;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brock, Steven;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less