Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/11/2021 at 02:59:54 (UTC).

Britt's Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc.,JACQUET, JEAN RAPHAEL vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Britt's Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc ,JACQUET, JEAN RAPHAEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6511

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Britt's Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc. A/A/O Jean Raphael Jacquet

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

JACQUET, JEAN RAPHAEL

Britt's Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc.

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A.

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

TUCKER , LAUREN JOSEPHINE

Attorney at MS. LAUREN JOSEPHINE TUCKER

100 2Nd Ave S Ste 500S

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/24/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/19/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Britt's Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Britt's Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Britt's Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Britt's Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Britt's Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Britt's Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Britt's Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Britt's Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Britt's Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER