This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/09/2023 at 12:51:36 (UTC).

Bright Home Solar LLC vs Empire Solar Group LLC

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 Bright Home Solar LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Empire Solar Group LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh and Holder, P. Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1119

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

Holder, P. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bright Home Solar LLC

Kosto & Rotella P.A. P O Box 113

Orlando, FL 32802

Defendant

Empire Solar Group LLC

9 Exchange Place Suite 400

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Counter Defendant

Bright Home Solar, LLC

Losto & Rotella P.A. P O Box 113

Orlando, FL 32802

Counter Plaintiff

Empire Solar Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorney

BOOS, ROBERT WALTER, II

Attorney at ADAMS AND REESE LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 4000

Tampa, FL 33602-3615

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

05/04/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

ORDER DIRECTING

09/03/2021: ORDER DIRECTING

ORDER

09/03/2021: ORDER

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

08/05/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

08/05/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

ORDER

07/02/2021: ORDER

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/14/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/21/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

05/19/2021: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: BANK; Judgment Description: BANKRUPTCY; Judge: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBANKRUPTCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY; Additional Info: Defendant: Empire Solar Group LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING; Comment: COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA SUPREME COURT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER AOSC20-23; Additional Info: Counter-Defendant: Bright Home Solar, LLC; Counter-Plaintiff: Empire Solar Group, LLC; Defendant: Empire Solar Group LLC; Plaintiff: Bright Home Solar LLC; Private Attorney: BOOS, ROBERT W, II, Esquire; Date Signed: 09/03/2021; Judicial Officer:: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: REQUIRING ALL NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS TO INCLUDE A CERTIFICATE OF GOOD FAITH CONFERRAL PRIOR TO FILING THE MOTION; Additional Info: Counter-Defendant: Bright Home Solar, LLC; Counter-Plaintiff: Empire Solar Group, LLC; Defendant: Empire Solar Group LLC; Plaintiff: Bright Home Solar LLC; Private Attorney: BOOS, ROBERT W, II, Esquire; Date 2: 09/03/2021; Judicial Officer:: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF CONTINUED DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Counter-Plaintiff: Empire Solar Group, LLC; Defendant: Empire Solar Group LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF CONTINUED DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON - TO - FOR; Comment: REMOVE AND DISCHARGE ATTY FOR PLTF AS STATED HEREIN; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bright Home Solar LLC; Date Signed: 07/06/2021; Judicial Officer:: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: REQUIRING ALL NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS TO INCLUDE A CERTIFICATE OF GOOD FAITH CONFERRAL PRIOR TO FILING THE MOTION; Additional Info: Counter-Defendant: Bright Home Solar, LLC; Counter-Plaintiff: Empire Solar Group, LLC; Defendant: Empire Solar Group LLC; Plaintiff: Bright Home Solar LLC; Private Attorney: BOOS, ROBERT W, II, Esquire; Private Attorney: GRIMLAND , ZACHARY DAVID; Date 2: 07/02/2021; Judicial Officer:: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING; Comment: 9/15/2021 @ 1:30 pm; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bright Home Solar LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Empire Solar Group LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Empire Solar Group LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSignature Page For Clerk's Default; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bright Home Solar LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF PROCESS SERVER-ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bright Home Solar LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 1 - zach@grimlandlaw.com; Additional Info: Defendant: Empire Solar Group LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bright Home Solar LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bright Home Solar LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bright Home Solar LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bright Home Solar LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less