Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/01/2019 at 14:26:29 (UTC).

BRIGHAM, CAROLYN vs TAMPA SNF LLC

Case Summary

On 08/11/2016 BRIGHAM, CAROLYN filed an Other lawsuit against TAMPA SNF LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lee, Moore. Laurel and Levens, P. William. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7586

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lee, Moore. Laurel

Levens, P. William

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRIGHAM, CAROLYN

Tampa, FL 33603

DAVIS, ROBERT L, Jr

ESTATE OF FRANCES DAVIS

DAVIS, LUCIOUS G

Defendants

EXCEL CARE CENTER

2811 Campus Hill Drive

Tampa, FL 33612

HALLMARK ACCOUNTING GROUP LLC

300 Arthur Godfrey Road Suite 203

Miami Beach, FL 33140

TAMPA SNF LLC

2811 Campus Hill Drive

Tampa, FL 33612

EXCEL REHABILITATION AND NURSING CENTER

2811 Campus Hill Drive

Tampa, FL 33612

BAYOU SHORE SNF LLC

435 42Nd Avenue South

St. Petersburg, FL 33705

HALLMARK ACCOUNTING LLC

368 New Hempstead Road #309

New York, NY 10956

EXCEL FACILITY INC

2811 Campus Hill Dr

Tampa, FL 33612

REHABILITATION CENTER OF ST. PETE

435 42Nd Avenue South

St. Petersburg, FL 33705

BOGOMILSKY, TZVI

North Miami Beach, FL 33179

EXCEL REHABILITATION AND HEALTH CENTERS

2811 Campus Hill Drive

Tampa, FL 33612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TURNBULL , SANGA TACCUMA

Attorney at SMITH AND STALLWORTH LAW FIRM

500 S Florida Ave Ste 510

Lakeland, FL 33801

Defendant Attorneys

REED , SCOTT LOUIS

390 N Orange Ave Ste 1610

Orlando, FL 32801

JONES , KENNETH SCOTT

Attorney at HUMPHREY LAW GROUP

1173 Spring Centre South Blvd Ste C

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

HUMPHREY, MARK ALAN

Attorney at HUMPHREY LAW GROUP

Po Box 400

Cape Canaveral, FL 32920

HASTINGS , KELLI BIFERIE

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF KELLI BIFERIE HASTINGS

4005 N Orange Blossom Trl Fl 2

Orlando, FL 32804

COOK , JACK TOBIAS

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A.

20 N Orange Ave Fl 9

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/29/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/29/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/19/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/23/2016: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/02/2016: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/12/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/12/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/11/2016: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/11/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/03/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/02/2016: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/02/2016: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/02/2016: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/12/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/12/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/11/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/11/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/11/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BRIGHAM, CAROLYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2019
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA SNF LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2019
  • NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA SNF LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2019
  • MOTION TO STRIKE; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF CASE AT ISSUE; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA SNF LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • NOTICE THAT CAUSE IS AT ISSUE; Comment: (PLTF'S) NOTICE OF CASE AT ISSUE & READY FOR TRIAL &/OR MOT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BRIGHAM, CAROLYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA SNF LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Comment: CAROLYN BRIGHAM; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA SNF LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Comment: 2X, COS 9/12/18 - SUBPS ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA SNF LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: PLT - OF THE DEPO OF CORRINE PETER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BRIGHAM, CAROLYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: DEPOSITION OF SUSAN SHOFFSTALL, ON 09/12/18 AT 10:00 AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BRIGHAM, CAROLYN

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Judgment Code: OOTF; Judgment Description: ORDER ON - TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2017377501; Judge: Lee, Laurel Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REHABILITATION CENTER OF WINTER PARK AKA is a litigant

Latest cases where EXCEL FACILITY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TURNBULL , SANGA TACCUMA