This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/25/2023 at 05:49:01 (UTC).

Brickhouse Inspections Inc. vs American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 Brickhouse Inspections Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4379

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brickhouse Inspections Inc.

Jimenez, Marianela

Defendant

American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE ARMAS , FABIOLA MARGARITA

Defendant Attorney

RAMSAMMY , LOUISA MANDY

 

Court Documents

MOTION

04/03/2023: MOTION

NOTICE OF FILING

03/03/2023: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/24/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/24/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/02/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVING

01/16/2023: NOTICE OF SERVING

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/16/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REPLY

01/13/2023: REPLY

ANSWER

01/12/2023: ANSWER

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

12/20/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/05/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

COMPLAINT

11/02/2022: COMPLAINT

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/03/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

11/03/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/02/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/02/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/02/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: TO COMPEL DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: JURAT PAGE - ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Additional Info: Defendant: American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY; Comment: TO DEFENDANT'S AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brickhouse Inspections Inc.; Plaintiff: Jimenez, Marianela;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Comment: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brickhouse Inspections Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brickhouse Inspections Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brickhouse Inspections Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brickhouse Inspections Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brickhouse Inspections Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brickhouse Inspections Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brickhouse Inspections Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less