This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 04:41:56 (UTC).

BRIAN DRUTMAN, D.C., LLC,Figueroa, Sintia vs PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 BRIAN DRUTMAN, D C , LLC,Figueroa, Sintia filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7359

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRIAN DRUTMAN, D.C., LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Figueroa, Sintia

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

MUNIZ , HECTOR DANILLO, Jr

Attorney at ANDREWS BIERNACKI DAVIS

5802 Breckenridge Pkwy Ste 103

Tampa, FL 33610

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/27/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/28/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/22/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/01/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/01/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO STRIKE

09/15/2022: MOTION TO STRIKE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

09/15/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BRIAN DRUTMAN, D.C., LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Comment: DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BRIAN DRUTMAN, D.C., LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY; Private Attorney: MUNIZ , HECTOR DANILLO, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY; Private Attorney: MUNIZ , HECTOR DANILLO, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BRIAN DRUTMAN, D.C., LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BRIAN DRUTMAN, D.C., LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BRIAN DRUTMAN, D.C., LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BRIAN DRUTMAN, D.C., LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BRIAN DRUTMAN, D.C., LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BRIAN DRUTMAN, D.C., LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BRIAN DRUTMAN, D.C., LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIAN DRUTMAN, D.C., LLC, as assignee of Yashakii is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HECTOR DANILLO MUNIZ JR