Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/28/2019 at 15:34:54 (UTC).

BREZINA, DANA vs INWOOD PARK TAMPA OWNER LLC

Case Summary

On 03/21/2016 BREZINA, DANA filed an Other lawsuit against INWOOD PARK TAMPA OWNER LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Huey, L. Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2668

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Huey, L. Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RULE, JADA

Tampa, FL 33602

LONGMIRE, ALAEZEA

Tampa, FL 33602

BREZINA, DANA

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Bonel Building Corp Inc

C/O Richard Noble Ra 3802 Gunn Highway Suite B

Tampa, FL 33618

SUBURBAN PROPANE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Rooks Contracting Inc

C/O Lamar Rooks, Ra, 13023 Delwood Road

Tampa, FL 33624

INWOOD PARK TAMPA OWNER LLC

C/O Registered Agent Solutions Ra 155 Office Plaza Suite A

Tallahassee, FL 32301

BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC

C/O Registered Agent Solutions Ra 155 Office Plaza Suite A

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Rooks Contracting Inc

C/O Lamar Rooks, Ra, 13023 Delwood Road

Tampa, FL 33624

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KROPOG , DARRELL WAYNE, Jr

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, TAMPA

201 N Franklin St Ste 700

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KRAFT , MICHAEL

Attorney at CONROY SIMBERG

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33602

WORDEN , JENNIFER CLAIRE

Attorney at MARTINEZ DENBO, LLC

2935 1St Ave N Ste 5

St Petersburg, FL 33713

HAAS , RAYMOND A, Esquire

Attorney at HD LAW PARTNERS

Po Box 23567

Tampa, FL 33623

KOBY , SHAUN ROBERT

Attorney at LYDECKER DIAZ

4350 W Cypress St Ste 910

Tampa, FL 33607

JOHNSON , STEPHEN HUNTER

1221 Brickell Ave Fl 19

Miami, FL 33131

KOWALSKI , DAVID

Attorney at LYDECKER - DIAZ

4350 W Cypress St Ste 910

Tampa, FL 33607

IACONO , VINCENT FRANK

Attorney at LYDECKER DIAZ

4350 W Cypress St Ste 910

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

HAAS , RAYMOND A, Esquire

Attorney at HD LAW PARTNERS

Po Box 23567

Tampa, FL 33623

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT

12/20/2016: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/04/2016: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

MOTION TO COMPEL

08/02/2016: MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

05/03/2016: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

REQUEST FOR COPIES

04/08/2016: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NO SUBPOENAS ATTACHED

04/01/2016: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NO SUBPOENAS ATTACHED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/30/2016: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/21/2016: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

03/21/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/09/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/15/2016: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

EXHIBIT

08/02/2016: EXHIBIT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/06/2016: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/01/2016: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

04/11/2016: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

REQUEST FOR COPIES

04/08/2016: REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/21/2016: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

02/13/2018: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

267 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • ORDER ON - TO - FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: PLTFS PETITION TO APPROVE THE SETTLEMENT OF A MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PETITION; Comment: TO APPROVE THE SETTLEMENT OF A MINOR; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BREZINA, DANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: 8/3/17 @ 3 PM - DFDT'S MOTION FOR DISMISSAL FOR FRAUD ON THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT; Comment: FULL AND COMPLETE SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • NOTICE; Comment: OF CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
377 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 4 DWKPleadings@forthepeople.com ; CWills@forthepeople.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 4 DWKPleadings@forthepeople.com ; CWills@forthepeople.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 4 DWKPleadings@forthepeople.com ; CWills@forthepeople.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 4 DWKPleadings@forthepeople.com ; CWills@forthepeople.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Judgment Code: OOTF; Judgment Description: ORDER ON - TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2017496738; Judge: Huey, Paul L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017242616; Judge: Huey, Paul L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2018066030; Judge: Huey, Paul L

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bonel Building Corp Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Suburban Propane is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAAS, RAYMOND A