This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/21/2022 at 00:15:56 (UTC).

Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P..A.,BURRESS, LELAND vs Government Employees Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 Brett M Herrington, D C , P A ,BURRESS, LELAND filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Government Employees Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gutman, N. Jack and Gutman, Jack. N. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5343

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gutman, N. Jack

Gutman, Jack. N

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P..A.

Tampa, FL 33607

BURRESS, LELAND

Defendant

Government Employees Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH , DANIEL B

Attorney at MORGAN AND MORGAN

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

PARKER , SHIKITA YVONNE

Attorney at GEICO STAFF COUNSEL

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/12/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/12/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/12/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/12/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

08/12/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/12/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/13/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

08/13/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/19/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/19/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/19/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/19/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/19/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P..A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P..A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P..A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P..A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P..A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P..A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P..A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P..A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH , DANIEL B