This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/11/2021 at 04:34:26 (UTC).

Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P.A.,COLLINS, BURT vs Geico General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Brett M Herrington, D C , P A ,COLLINS, BURT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5667

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P.A. A/A/O Burt Collins

Tampa, FL 33607

Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P.A.

Tampa, FL 33607

COLLINS, BURT

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH , DANIEL B

Attorney at MORGAN AND MORGAN

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

GODFREY , PAUL RYAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 500

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/15/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/09/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/13/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/13/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/09/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brett M. Herrington, D.C., P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH , DANIEL B