This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/30/2021 at 06:08:50 (UTC).

Brahmas Hospitality LLC vs Eubanks, Donte

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Brahmas Hospitality LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Eubanks, Donte. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4497

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brahmas Hospitality LLC dba Rodeway Inn

3550 Buschwood Park Drive Suite 150

Tampa, FL 33618

Brahmas Hospitality LLC

3550 Buschwood Park Drive Suite 150

Tampa, FL 33618

Rodeway Inn

Defendants

Eubanks, Donte

Tampa, FL 33605

In Possession, All Unknown Tenants

Tampa, FL 33605

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THALJI , SAMI

Attorney at FLORIDA CONSUMER LAWYERS

3550 Buschwood Park Dr Ste 150

Tampa, FL 33618

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

09/03/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

ANSWER

07/15/2021: ANSWER

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/08/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/08/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/06/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/06/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/06/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/06/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/06/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brahmas Hospitality LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Instrument Number: 2021446539; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Comment: FOR POSSESSION - EVICTION POSSESSION ONLY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brahmas Hospitality LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: SEPTEMBER 2, 2021, at 9:00 AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brahmas Hospitality LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT; Comment: AGAINST DONTE EUBANKS AND ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION N/K/A JASMINE EUBANKS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brahmas Hospitality LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brahmas Hospitality LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brahmas Hospitality LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brahmas Hospitality LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brahmas Hospitality LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brahmas Hospitality LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brahmas Hospitality LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brahmas Hospitality LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THALJI , SAMI