This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/24/2020 at 17:52:29 (UTC).

Bradley, Bruce A. vs KB Home

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Bradley, Bruce A filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB Home. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cook, J.. Martha. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5562

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cook, J.. Martha

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bradley, Bruce A.

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendants

KB Home

Wilmington, DE 19808

KB HOME ORLANDO, LLC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

KB HOME TAMPA, LLC

1201 Hays Street 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

3Rd Party Defendants

A&B STUCCO, INC.

SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS, INC.

ARCHER EXTERIORS, INC.

ADVANCED WRAPPING & CONCRETE SOLUTIONS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA, INC.

3Rd Party Plaintiffs

KB HOME TAMPA LLC

KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBRIEN , NEIL PATRICK

Attorney at FLORIN ROEBIG P.A.

777 Alderman Rd

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

MOYA , FRANK THOMAS

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/20/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/20/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/20/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/10/2020: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/10/2020: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/10/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketE-FILED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT; Comment: COS 08/06/2020 / EXHIBITS ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: KB HOME ORLANDO, LLC; Defendant: KB HOME TAMPA, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: KB HOME TAMPA, LLC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, AS RA 7/17/2020; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bradley, Bruce A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: KB ORLANDO, LLC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, AS RA 7/17/2020; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bradley, Bruce A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: KB HOME C/O THE PRENTICE-HALL CORPORATION SYSTEM AS RA 7/17/2020; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bradley, Bruce A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bradley, Bruce A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bradley, Bruce A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bradley, Bruce A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bradley, Bruce A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bradley, Bruce A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bradley, Bruce A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x3 - CNservice@florinroebig.com ; nobrien@florinroebig.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: KB Home; Defendant: KB HOME ORLANDO, LLC; Defendant: KB HOME TAMPA, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x3 - CNservice@florinroebig.com ; nobrien@florinroebig.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x3 - CNservice@florinroebig.com ; nobrien@florinroebig.com

    Read MoreRead Less