This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/26/2019 at 14:27:53 (UTC).

Bracciale, Stephen vs Valdez, Pedro

Case Summary

On 08/18/2017 Bracciale, Stephen filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Valdez, Pedro. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas, K. Cheryl, Stephens, Scott. Steven and Holder, P. Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7866

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Thomas, K. Cheryl

Stephens, Scott. Steven

Holder, P. Gregory

 

Party Details

Counter Defendants and Plaintiffs

BRACCIALE, STEPHEN

Tampa, FL 33613

Saint Anton Capital, LLC

16607 Villa Lenda De Avila

Tampa, FL 33613

SAINT ANTON CAPITAL LLC

Defendants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Counter Plaintiffs

Valdez, Pedro

Tampa, FL 33614

National Sourcing, Inc.

3415 East Frontage Road, Suite B

Tampa, FL 33607

Gordon, Brent A

Tampa, FL 33602

NATIONAL SOURCING INC

3Rd Party Defendants

GREENBERG TRAURING PA

TEK SOURCE USA INC

TAM, ANGELUS

DUNKER, WILLIAM, Esquire

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DE LA PENA, GREGORY R, Esquire

KIMBRO , BRADFORD DEAN

Attorney at HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP

Po Box 1288

Tampa, FL 33601

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

GREENLEE, PAIGE A, Esquire

Attorney at GREENLEE LAW PLLC

1304 S Desoto Avenue Suite 203

Tampa, FL 33606

DEES , KEVIN LEE

Attorney at OLDER LUNDY & ALVAREZ

3014 W Palmira Ave Ste 202

Tampa, FL 33629

HATCHER-BOLIN , KRISTIE L.

Attorney at GRAY ROBINSON, P.A.

Po Box 3

Lakeland, FL 33802

WAGGONER , DENNIS PARKER

Po Box 2231

Tampa, FL 33601

MITCHELL , J. CARLTON

Attorney at OLDER LUNDY & ALVAREZ

1000 W Cass St

Tampa, FL 33606

LILLY , SCOTT RANDALL

Attorney at LILLY LAW, PLLC

400 N Tampa St Ste 1100

Tampa, FL 33602

OREBAUGH , LAUREN

Attorney at DE LA PENA & HOLIDAY, LLP

400 N Tampa St Ste 2840

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

WAGGONER , DENNIS PARKER

Po Box 2231

Tampa, FL 33601

GANDRE , KRISTINA ANN

Attorney at HILL WARD HENDERSON

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

BOSTIC, TERRANCE A

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN GOGGIN

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1100

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

AMENDED MOTION TO - FOR

02/25/2019: AMENDED MOTION TO - FOR

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

02/25/2019: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER FROM DCA

02/21/2019: ORDER FROM DCA

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/19/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO - FOR

02/12/2019: MOTION TO - FOR

AMENDED MOTION TO - FOR

02/12/2019: AMENDED MOTION TO - FOR

ORDER FROM DCA

02/08/2019: ORDER FROM DCA

ORDER FROM DCA

02/08/2019: ORDER FROM DCA

REPORT

02/07/2019: REPORT

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/21/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

EX PARTE MOTION

08/21/2017: EX PARTE MOTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/18/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/18/2017: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

08/18/2017: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/18/2017: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/18/2017: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

ORDER ON - TO - FOR

09/25/2018: ORDER ON - TO - FOR

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

08/25/2017: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

526 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: PLAINTIFFS - TO SEVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FROM DCA; Comment: 2D18-0124, 2D18-0128, 2D18-2703 CONSOLIDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Additional Info: Defendant: National Sourcing, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR; Comment: SET ACTION FOR TRIAL IN THE EVENT OF A SEVERANCE ORDER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bracciale, Stephen; Plaintiff: Saint Anton Capital, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: DISMISS COUNTER-PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COUNTER/THIRD-PARTY CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bracciale, Stephen; Plaintiff: Saint Anton Capital, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FROM DCA; Comment: 2D18-0128, 2D18-0124, 2D18-2703 CONSOLIDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FROM DCA; Comment: 2D18-0128, 2D18-0124, 2D18-2703 CONSOLIDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bracciale, Stephen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: MOTION TO STRIKE OR CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
523 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 2 kehoeg@gtlaw.com ; meyerp@gtlaw.com ; turnerjo@gtlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE MOTION; Comment: *EMERGENCY MOTION* FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bracciale, Stephen; Plaintiff: Saint Anton Capital, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: RELATED CASE 17-CA-6700

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Code: OOTF; Judgment Description: ORDER ON - TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2018398169; Judge: Stephens, Steven Scott

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Code: NORFC; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Judge: Holder, Gregory P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL SOURCING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WAGGONER , DENNIS PARKER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOSTIC, TERRANCE