This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/19/2021 at 13:08:47 (UTC).

Boze Family Chiropractic and Wellness Center, LLC,HINCHEY, ADRIANNA vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Boze Family Chiropractic and Wellness Center, LLC,HINCHEY, ADRIANNA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a foreign corporation. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, M. Frances and Perrone, Frances. M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5470

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, M. Frances

Perrone, Frances. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Boze Family Chiropractic and Wellness Center, LLC

121 West Forsyth

Jacksonville, FL 32202

HINCHEY, ADRIANNA

Defendants

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAGAN , JONATHAN JAMES

Attorney at CAGAN & CAGAN PLLC

121 W Forsyth St Ste 810

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3857

Defendant Attorney

KAMPF , DAVID B

Attorney at RAMEY & KAMPF, P.A.

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/20/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/12/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/12/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/09/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021436305; Judge: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Boze Family Chiropractic and Wellness Center, LLC; Plaintiff: HINCHEY, ADRIANNA; Private Attorney: CAGAN , JONATHAN JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Boze Family Chiropractic and Wellness Center, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Boze Family Chiropractic and Wellness Center, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Boze Family Chiropractic and Wellness Center, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Boze Family Chiropractic and Wellness Center, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Boze Family Chiropractic and Wellness Center, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Boze Family Chiropractic and Wellness Center, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Boze Family Chiropractic and Wellness Center, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boze Family Chiropractic and Wellness Center, LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kampf, David B, ESQ.