This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/11/2019 at 19:20:33 (UTC).

BOWE, ARLENE DIANA vs BOWE, JERE WYNTON

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 BOWE, ARLENE DIANA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BOWE, JERE WYNTON. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tibbals, D. Wesley and Lefler, Lawrence. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8404

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tibbals, D. Wesley

Lefler, Lawrence

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOWE, ARLENE DIANA

Tampa, FL 33613

Respondent

BOWE, JERE WYNTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (FAMILY); Comment: DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: BOWE, ARLENE DIANA; Respondent: BOWE, JERE WYNTON; Date Signed: 04/01/2019; Judicial Officer: Lefler, Lawrence; Vol./Book: 26529, Page: 706, Number of Pages: 706

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS; Additional Info: Petitioner: BOWE, ARLENE DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • ORDER DIRECTING; Comment: PARTIES TO FILE; Additional Info: Date Signed: 02/22/2019; Judicial Officer: Lefler, Lawrence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY; Additional Info: Petitioner: BOWE, ARLENE DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED; Comment: JERE WYNTON BOWE; Additional Info: Petitioner: BOWE, ARLENE DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Comment: AS TO NOTICE OF ACTION; Additional Info: Petitioner: BOWE, ARLENE DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Petitioner: BOWE, ARLENE DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • LETTER FROM; Comment: 13TH JUDICIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Comment: FILE DOCUMENTS AND SETTING NEXT CMC; Additional Info: Date Signed: 12/04/2018; Judicial Officer: Tibbals, Wesley D

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2018
  • CIVIL AFFIDAVIT APPL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT; Additional Info: Petitioner: BOWE, ARLENE DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • 12 RULES OF COURTROOM BEHAVIOR; Additional Info: Petitioner: BOWE, ARLENE DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • NON-LAWYER DISCLOSURE FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: BOWE, ARLENE DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: BOWE, ARLENE DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Petitioner: BOWE, ARLENE DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY; Additional Info: Petitioner: BOWE, ARLENE DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: BOWE, ARLENE DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: BOWE, ARLENE DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • STANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW; Additional Info: Petitioner: BOWE, ARLENE DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO; Comment: JERE WYNTON BOWE

    Read MoreRead Less