This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/01/2022 at 13:14:20 (UTC).

Bond Auto Glass Of Orlando, Llc vs Usaa Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 Bond Auto Glass Of Orlando, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Usaa Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0740

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bond Auto Glass Of Orlando, Llc

808 West Deleon St.

Tampa, FL 33606

CAMPOS, JACOB

Defendant

Usaa Casualty Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALKIN , CHRISTOPHER P

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER P. CALKIN P.A.

808 W De Leon St

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

TOBIN , LEE ANDREW

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/10/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/10/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/10/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/10/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/11/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/11/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/17/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/23/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Usaa Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Usaa Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bond Auto Glass Of Orlando, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bond Auto Glass Of Orlando, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bond Auto Glass Of Orlando, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bond Auto Glass Of Orlando, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bond Auto Glass Of Orlando, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bond Auto Glass, Llc., As Assignee Of, Morgan Jennings, is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE TOBIN