Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/23/2021 at 08:53:50 (UTC).

BOLDING, ALAN EDWARD - Estate

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 BOLDING, ALAN EDWARD - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0828

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

HINES, JAMES P, Jr

Tampa, FL 33606

BOLDING, BRIAN

BOLDING, GARY

BOLDING, PAUL

BOLDING, DEREK

BOLDING, NIGEL

BOLDING, SARAH

BOLDING, CHARLOTTE

BOLDING, SCOTT

LAMERTON, ALAYNE

Decedent

BOLDING, ALAN EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

FRIEDRICH , ASHLEY GIANNA

Attorney at HINES NORMAN HINES, P.L.

315 S Hyde Park Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketWVR OF ACCT & SRVC OF PET-DISC; Comment: CHARLOTTE BOLDING; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketW-ACTG-PET-SVC-P-CNSENT DISCH; Comment: ALAYNE LAMBERTON; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketW-ACTG-PET-SVC-P-CNSENT DISCH; Comment: DEREK BOLDING; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketW-ACTG-PET-SVC-P-CNSENT DISCH; Comment: GARY BOLDING; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketW-ACTG-PET-SVC-P-CNSENT DISCH; Comment: NIGEL BOLDING; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketW-ACTG-PET-SVC-P-CNSENT DISCH; Comment: PAUL BOLDING; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketW-ACTG-PET-SVC-P-CNSENT DISCH; Comment: SCOTT BOLDING; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS; Comment: JAMES P HINES JR; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: BOLDING, SARAH

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: EXEMPLIFIED COPY-FILER HAS BEEN NOTIFIED TO SUBMIT THE ORIGINAL PAPERWORKTO THE CLERK S OFFICE FOR PROCESSING; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: SUZANNE JANE MARRIOTT; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: NIGEL BOLDING; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: PAUL BOLDING; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: GARY BOLDING; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: CHARLOTTE BOLDING; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: SCOTT BOLDING; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: DEREK BOLDING; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: ALAYNE LAMERTON A/K/A ALAYNE LAMMERTON; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDRICH , ASHLEY GIANNA