This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/08/2020 at 18:56:36 (UTC).

Blue Ray Investments, LLC vs J&D Financial Solutions, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Blue Ray Investments, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against J D Financial Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Stoddard, C.. Ralph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5559

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Stoddard, C.. Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blue Ray Investments, LLC

C/O Kristopher E. Fernandez, Esquire 114 S. Fremont Avenue

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants

Doe, Jane

Tampa, FL 33549

J&D Financial Solutions, LLC

Derlys B. Fernandez, As Registered Agent 1717 W. Sligh Avenue

Tampa, FL 33604

Doe, John

Tampa, FL 33549

Fernandez, Derlys B.

Tampa, FL 33604

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDEZ , KRISTOPHER EMIL

114 S Fremont Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

ANTON , DAVID

Attorney at ANTON LEGAL GROUP

2503 W Swann Ave Ste 112

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/24/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/18/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

07/10/2020: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020: COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS

07/10/2020: LIS PENDENS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/10/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/10/2020: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Doe, Jane; Defendant: Fernandez, Derlys B.; Defendant: J&D Financial Solutions, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Blue Ray Investments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Doe, Jane; Defendant: Fernandez, Derlys B.; Defendant: J&D Financial Solutions, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketANSWER; Comment: TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Doe, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ORIGINAL RETURN OF SERVICE AS TO JOHN DOE- AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Blue Ray Investments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Blue Ray Investments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ORGINAL RETURN OF SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT- AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Blue Ray Investments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ORGINAL RETRUN OF SERVICE- AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Blue Ray Investments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ORIGINAL RETURN OF SERVICE- AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Blue Ray Investments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Blue Ray Investments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Blue Ray Investments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Blue Ray Investments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Blue Ray Investments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Blue Ray Investments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Blue Ray Investments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: Doe, Jane; Defendant: Doe, John; Defendant: Fernandez, Derlys B.; Defendant: J&D Financial Solutions, LLC; Plaintiff: Blue Ray Investments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4 - kfernandez@kfernandezlaw.com ; ryan@kfernandezlaw.com ; service@kfernandezlaw.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: Doe, Jane; Defendant: Doe, John; Defendant: Fernandez, Derlys B.; Defendant: J&D Financial Solutions, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4 - kfernandez@kfernandezlaw.com ; ryan@kfernandezlaw.com ; service@kfernandezlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4 - kfernandez@kfernandezlaw.com ; ryan@kfernandezlaw.com ; service@kfernandezlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4 - kfernandez@kfernandezlaw.com ; ryan@kfernandezlaw.com ; service@kfernandezlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less