This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/21/2023 at 22:35:46 (UTC).

BIENES HERNANDEZ, FRANK vs UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/14/2022 BIENES HERNANDEZ, FRANK filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, Emily. A, Peacock, Emily A and Peacock, A. Emily. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0349

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, Emily. A

Peacock, Emily A

Peacock, A. Emily

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIENES HERNANDEZ, FRANK

Valrico, FL 33596

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As R/A 200 Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAMS , JILL ELIZABETH

Attorney at ADAMS LAW ASSOCIATION P.A.

1074 Bloomingdale Ave

Valrico, FL 33596

Defendant Attorney

VARGAS , CAROLAY

Attorney at GROELLE & SALMON ATTORNEYS AT LAW

1715 N West Shore Blvd Ste 320

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/14/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

12/14/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/14/2022: NOTICE OF REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

12/14/2022: COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/14/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/14/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/14/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE

12/16/2022: NOTICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/16/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/02/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

01/02/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

ORDER GRANTING

01/03/2023: ORDER GRANTING

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/3058068636 MEETING ID: 305-806-8636 NO PASSWORD IS REQUIREDTELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME CODE AS ZOOM ID; Judicial Officer: Peacock, Emily A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Comment: AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Plaintiff: BIENES HERNANDEZ, FRANK; Private Attorney: ADAMS , JILL ELIZABETH; Date Signed: 01/03/2023; Judicial Officer:: Peacock, Emily A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY- 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER & NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING ON 7/14/2023 AT 10:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIENES HERNANDEZ, FRANK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIENES HERNANDEZ, FRANK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIENES HERNANDEZ, FRANK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIENES HERNANDEZ, FRANK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIENES HERNANDEZ, FRANK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIENES HERNANDEZ, FRANK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIENES HERNANDEZ, FRANK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIENES HERNANDEZ, FRANK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less