Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/03/2021 at 05:40:12 (UTC).

BIBBY, ELAINE DANIELLE vs SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 BIBBY, ELAINE DANIELLE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, James. S and Moody, S. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9174

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, James. S

Moody, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIBBY, ELAINE DANIELLE

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIAZ , ARISTIDES JUAN

Attorney at MARIN, ELJAIEK, LOPEZ & MATRINEZ

250 N Orange Ave Ste 605

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

DENNIS , WILLIAM JOSEPH

Attorney at KUBICKI DRAPER

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

03/26/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/25/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/25/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Private Attorney: DENNIS , WILLIAM JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Private Attorney: DENNIS , WILLIAM JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Private Attorney: DENNIS , WILLIAM JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIBBY, ELAINE DANIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Private Attorney: DENNIS , WILLIAM JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND EMAIL DESIGNATION; Additional Info: Private Attorney: DENNIS , WILLIAM JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIBBY, ELAINE DANIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIBBY, ELAINE DANIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIBBY, ELAINE DANIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIBBY, ELAINE DANIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIBBY, ELAINE DANIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIBBY, ELAINE DANIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIBBY, ELAINE DANIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIBBY, ELAINE DANIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BIBBY, ELAINE DANIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM J DENNIS, ESQ