This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/31/2022 at 12:08:16 (UTC).

BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLC vs UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/02/2022 BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0549

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLC

2061 Nw 112Th Ave. Suite 142

Miami, FL 33172

TOSTE, DARIEL MARQUEZ

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

1100 West Commercial Boulevard

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ , ROBERT FRANCIS

Attorney at THE FLORIDA INSURANCE LAW GROUP, LLC

8724 Sw 72Nd St # 260

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/02/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

08/02/2022: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/02/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/02/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/02/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

08/03/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/03/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/16/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, STEPHEN J. DONAGHY, AUGUST 15, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gonzalez, Robert Francis, ESQ.