This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/03/2020 at 17:16:26 (UTC).

Berry, Timothy vs Orkin, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Berry, Timothy filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Orkin, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Rice, G. Elizabeth and Hinson, C.. Carl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0370

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Rice, G. Elizabeth

Hinson, C.. Carl

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Foster, Andrew

Tampa, FL 33609

Berry, Timothy

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendants

Clarke, Eulie

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Jarrett, Willis

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Wilson, Claudius

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Montero, Esther

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Orkin, LLC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARDILLO , PETER M

Attorney at CARDILLO LAW FIRM

712 S Oregon Ave Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

GERBER , DANIEL JAY

Attorney at RUMBERGER KIRK & CALDWELL

Po Box 1873

Orlando, FL 32802

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

10/10/2019: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

10/10/2019: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

10/02/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

10/02/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/13/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO DISMISS

05/17/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/17/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/22/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/11/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/11/2019: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/11/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/11/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

01/11/2019: PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/11/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE

01/11/2019: NOTICE

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/11/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Berry, Timothy; Plaintiff: Foster, Andrew; Private Attorney: CARDILLO , PETER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Berry, Timothy; Plaintiff: Foster, Andrew; Private Attorney: CARDILLO , PETER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Berry, Timothy; Plaintiff: Foster, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Berry, Timothy; Plaintiff: Foster, Andrew; Private Attorney: CARDILLO , PETER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Orkin, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: DUE TO CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE NOT SIGNED BY PROCESS SERVER; Additional Info: Defendant: Jarrett, Willis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: DUE TO CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE NOT SIGNED BY PROCESS SERVER; Additional Info: Defendant: Wilson, Claudius

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE FOR WILLIS JARRETT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Berry, Timothy; Plaintiff: Foster, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE FOR CLAUDIUS WILSON; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Berry, Timothy; Plaintiff: Foster, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: AGAINST WILLIS JARRETT; Additional Info: Defendant: Jarrett, Willis

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Berry, Timothy; Plaintiff: Foster, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Berry, Timothy; Plaintiff: Foster, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: kathlyn@cardillolaw.com ; pete@cardillolaw.com ; matt@mattcardillolaw.com ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Berry, Timothy; Plaintiff: Foster, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Berry, Timothy; Plaintiff: Foster, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Berry, Timothy; Plaintiff: Foster, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Berry, Timothy; Plaintiff: Foster, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Berry, Timothy; Plaintiff: Foster, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF DEMAND FOR PRESERVATION OF ELECTRONIC DATA AND OTHER EVIDENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Berry, Timothy; Plaintiff: Foster, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Berry, Timothy; Plaintiff: Foster, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less